IA SF2379 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 794.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 794.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to property law, including mobile homes and manufactured housing, rental agreements, landlord and tenant remedies for retaliation, wrongful failure to provide essential services, rent increases, the sale of manufactured home community or mobile home park, the repeal of the manufactured home community and mobile home tax, forcible entry and detainer actions, abandoned mobile homes, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 3151.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to property law, including mobile homes and manufactured housing, rental agreements, landlord and tenant remedies for retaliation, wrongful failure to provide essential services, rent increases, the sale of manufactured home community or mobile home park, the repeal of the manufactured home community and mobile home tax, forcible entry and detainer actions, abandoned mobile homes, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 3151.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 794. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | HF 2562 substituted. S.J. 790. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5131 filed, adopted. S.J. 790. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 2562. S.J. 713. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 563. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 561. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3151 (Related) 2022-03-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2379.