IA SF2376 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to annual all-systems permits issued by the department of transportation for vehicles of excessive weight, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2347, SSB 3106.) Effective date: 01/01/2023.
Title
A bill for an act relating to annual all-systems permits issued by the department of transportation for vehicles of excessive weight, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2347, SSB 3106.) Effective date: 01/01/2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 896. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 896. |
2022-04-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 848. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 767. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 1. S.J. 766. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5125. S.J. 766. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5125. S.J. 751. |
2022-04-12 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 839. |
2022-04-12 | House | Passed House, yeas 86, nays 7. H.J. 831. |
2022-04-12 | House | Amendment H-8353 adopted. H.J. 831. |
2022-04-11 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-04-06 | House | Amendment H-8353 filed. H.J. 823. |
2022-04-05 | House | Placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 812. |
2022-04-05 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 812. |
2022-04-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2022-03-31 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/04/2022 4:30PM House Lounge. |
2022-03-30 | House | Subcommittee: Hein, Kurth and Maxwell. H.J. 750. |
2022-03-30 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 736. |
2022-03-29 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 710. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 641. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 1. S.J. 641. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Amendment S-5097 filed, adopted. S.J. 641. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 562. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 560. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3106 (Related) 2022-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2347.
SF2347 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2376. S.J. 562.
SF2347 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2376. S.J. 562.