IA SF2372 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Subcommittee reassigned: Edler, Bolkcom, and Breitbach. S.J. 965.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the regulation of medical cannabidiol, by altering the list of debilitating medical conditions and changing the definition of medical cannabidiol under the medical cannabidiol Act, and exempting sales of medical cannabidiol products from Iowa sales tax. (Formerly SSB 3135; See SF 2405.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the regulation of medical cannabidiol, by altering the list of debilitating medical conditions and changing the definition of medical cannabidiol under the medical cannabidiol Act, and exempting sales of medical cannabidiol products from Iowa sales tax. (Formerly SSB 3135; See SF 2405.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateSubcommittee reassigned: Edler, Bolkcom, and Breitbach. S.J. 965.
2018-03-01SenateSubcommittee: Dawson, Bolkcom, and Breitbach. S.J. 512.
2018-02-28SenateReferred to Ways and Means. S.J. 479.
2018-02-26SenateFiscal note.
2018-02-20SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 400.
2018-02-20SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 395.

Same As/Similar To

SSB3135 (Related) 2018-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2405 (Similar To) 2018-04-24 - Fiscal note.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback