IA SF2370 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-24 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-24 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to aircraft, including special certificates issued to aircraft manufacturers, transporters, and dealers, and sales tax exemptions associated with aircraft, providing fees, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3152.) Effective date: 06/30/2022, 07/01/2022. Applicability date: 06/30/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to aircraft, including special certificates issued to aircraft manufacturers, transporters, and dealers, and sales tax exemptions associated with aircraft, providing fees, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3152.) Effective date: 06/30/2022, 07/01/2022. Applicability date: 06/30/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-24 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 942. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 941. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 712. |
2022-04-05 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 811. |
2022-05-23 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 901. |
2022-04-05 | House | Passed House, yeas 92, nays 5. H.J. 787. |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 751. |
2022-03-30 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 751. |
2022-03-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-03-24 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/28/2022 4:00PM House Lounge. |
2022-03-24 | House | Subcommittee: Hein, McConkey and Siegrist. H.J. 691. |
2022-03-23 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 644. |
2022-03-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 630. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 601. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 2. S.J. 600. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 552. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 447. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 446. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3152 (Related) 2022-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2370.