IA SF2370 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Labor and Business Relations. S.J. 693.
Pending: Senate Labor and Business Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Labor and Business Relations. S.J. 693.
Pending: Senate Labor and Business Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to public assistance program oversight and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3193.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to public assistance program oversight and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3193.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business Relations. S.J. 693. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 402. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 395. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3193 (Related) 2018-02-14 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2018 8:15AM RM 315
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF2370 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF2370.html |