IA SF2364 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to a construction manager-at-risk commercial construction alternative delivery method and prohibiting certain other alternative delivery methods in the public sector and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3153.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to a construction manager-at-risk commercial construction alternative delivery method and prohibiting certain other alternative delivery methods in the public sector and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3153.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Fiscal note. |
2020-06-05 | House | Amendments H-8217, H-8218, H-8219, H-8220, H-8221, H-8222, H-8223, H-8224, H-8225, H-8229 and H-8230 filed. H.J. 665. |
2020-06-04 | House | Amendment H-8215 filed |
2020-06-04 | House | Amendments H-8201, H-8202, H-8203, H-8207 and H-8208 filed. H.J. 646. |
2020-06-04 | House | Introduced, passed on file. H.J. 643. |
2020-06-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 642. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 675. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 29, nays 20. S.J. 674. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5089 adopted. S.J. 674. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5093 to S-5089 ruled out of order. S.J. 674. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5102 to S-5089 filed, lost. S.J. 673. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5094 to S-5089 withdrawn. S.J. 673. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5092 to S-5089 lost. S.J. 672. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5095 to S-5089 lost. S.J. 671. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Amendments S-5092, S-5093, S-5094, and S-5095 filed. S.J. 662. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Amendment S-5089 filed. S.J. 661. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 379. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 371. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB674 (Related) 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 323.
SSB3153 (Related) 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2364.
HF2572 (Similar To) 2020-06-13 - Amendments H-8307, H-8310 and H-8311 filed. H.J. 766.
SSB3153 (Related) 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2364.
HF2572 (Similar To) 2020-06-13 - Amendments H-8307, H-8310 and H-8311 filed. H.J. 766.