IA SF2362 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/11/2020 8:30AM House Lounge.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/11/2020 8:30AM House Lounge.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the appointment of a guardian ad litem for certain child prosecution witnesses. (Formerly SF 2277.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the appointment of a guardian ad litem for certain child prosecution witnesses. (Formerly SF 2277.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/11/2020 8:30AM House Lounge. |
2020-03-03 | House | Subcommittee: Hagenow, Paustian and Wilburn. H.J. 445. |
2020-03-02 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 411. |
2020-03-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 409. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 466. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 464. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 377. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 371. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2277 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2362. S.J. 377.