IA SF2361 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2383. S.J. 692.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2383. S.J. 692.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to various matters under the purview of the state, including city and county zoning, work-based learning, recruitment of health care professionals, regulations affecting veterans and military spouses, insurance producer temporary licenses, and the state building code, and including applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 3123; See SF 2383.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to various matters under the purview of the state, including city and county zoning, work-based learning, recruitment of health care professionals, regulations affecting veterans and military spouses, insurance producer temporary licenses, and the state building code, and including applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 3123; See SF 2383.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2383. S.J. 692. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2022 11:30AM Room G17. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, Jochum, and R. Smith. S.J. 370. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 334. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 355. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 347. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3123 (Related) 2022-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2361.
HSB682 (Related) 2022-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2527.
HF2527 (Similar To) 2022-03-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2569.
HF2569 (Similar To) 2022-04-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 861.
SF2383 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Fiscal note.
HSB682 (Related) 2022-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2527.
HF2527 (Similar To) 2022-03-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2569.
HF2569 (Similar To) 2022-04-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 861.
SF2383 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Fiscal note.