IA SF2361 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Withdrawn. S.J. 817.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to persons authorized to request assistance pursuant to the statewide mutual aid compact. (Formerly SSB 3154.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to persons authorized to request assistance pursuant to the statewide mutual aid compact. (Formerly SSB 3154.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-13SenateWithdrawn. S.J. 817.
2020-06-13SenateHF 2528 substituted. S.J. 816.
2020-03-04SenateAttached to companion HF 2528. S.J. 527.
2020-02-20SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 378.
2020-02-20SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 371.

Same As/Similar To

HF2318 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 484.
SSB3154 (Related) 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2361.
HF2528 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback