IA SF2360 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 930.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act creating the medical cannabidiol Act and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 3222.) Effective 7-1-14.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act creating the medical cannabidiol Act and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 3222.) Effective 7-1-14.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-30HouseSigned by Governor. S.J. 930.
2014-05-02HouseSent to Governor. S.J. 929.
2014-05-02HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 929.
2014-05-01HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 890.
2014-05-01SenateImmediate message. S.J. 914.
2014-05-01SenatePassed Senate, ayes 38, nays 8. S.J. 913.
2014-05-01SenateSenate concurred with S-5208. S.J. 913.
2014-05-01SenateMessage from House, with amendment S-5208. S.J. 912.
2014-04-30HouseImmediate message. H.J. 880.
2014-04-30HousePassed House, ayes 77, nays 20. H.J. 879.
2014-04-30HouseAmendments H-8360 and H-8361 filed, out of order. H.J. 879.
2014-04-30HouseAmendments H-8356, H-8357, H-8358, and H-8359 to amendment H-8345 filed, out of order. H.J. 879.
2014-04-30HouseAmendments H-8350, H-8351, H-8352, H-8353, H-8354, and H-8355 to amendment H-8345 filed, out of order. H.J. 878.
2014-04-30HouseAmendments H-8345, H-8346, H-8347, and H-8348 out of order. H.J. 878.
2014-04-30HouseAmendment H-8344 to committee amendment H-8333 out of order. H.J. 878.
2014-04-30HouseAmendments H-8334, H-8335, H-8336, H-8337, H-8338, H-8339, H-8340, H-8341, H-8342, and H-8343 out of order. H.J. 878.
2014-04-30HouseCommittee amendment H-8333 as amended, adopted. H.J. 878.
2014-04-30HouseAmendment H-8388 to committee amendment H-8333 filed, adopted. H.J. 878.
2014-04-30HouseAmendment H-8375 to committee amendment H-8333 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 877.
2014-04-29HouseAmendments H-8343, H-8344, H-8345, H-8346, H-8347, and H-8348 filed. H.J. 845.
2014-04-29HouseAmendments H-8334, H-8335, H-8336, H-8337, H-8338, H-8339, H-8340, H-8341, and H-8342 filed. H.J. 845.
2014-04-29HouseCommittee amendment H-8333 filed. H.J. 845.
2014-04-29HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 844.
2014-04-25HouseSubcommittee, Klein, Kressig, and Shaw. H.J. 819.
2014-04-25HouseRead first time, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 802.
2014-04-24HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 794.
2014-04-24SenateImmediate message. S.J. 846.
2014-04-24SenatePassed Senate, ayes 36, nays 12. S.J. 845.
2014-04-23SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 842.
2014-04-23SenateIntroduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 840.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback