IA SF2357 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 658.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 658.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the practice and licensure of physician assistants, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3071.) Effective date: 03/18/2020.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the practice and licensure of physician assistants, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3071.) Effective date: 03/18/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 658. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 658. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 611. |
2020-03-11 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 587. |
2020-03-12 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 592. |
2020-03-11 | House | Passed House, yeas 98, nays none. H.J. 583. |
2020-03-11 | House | Amendment H-8140 withdrawn. H.J. 582. |
2020-03-11 | House | Substituted for HF 2542. H.J. 582. |
2020-03-10 | House | Amendment H-8140 filed. H.J. 569. |
2020-03-03 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 421. |
2020-03-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 413. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 481. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 480. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 379. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 370. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3071 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2357.
HSB702 (Related) 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 320.
HF2542 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 587.
HSB702 (Related) 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 320.
HF2542 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 587.