IA SF2357 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Subcommittee: McKean, Gustafson and Lensing. H.J. 515.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Subcommittee: McKean, Gustafson and Lensing. H.J. 515.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to jurisdictional changes to small claims court cases. (Formerly SF 42.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to jurisdictional changes to small claims court cases. (Formerly SF 42.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Subcommittee: McKean, Gustafson and Lensing. H.J. 515. |
2018-03-02 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 446. |
2018-03-01 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 433. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 497. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 32, nays 17. S.J. 493. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 376. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 374. |
Same As/Similar To
SF42 (Similar To) 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.