IA SF2348 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to Education. S.J. 621.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to Education. S.J. 621.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to supplemental aid and modified supplemental amounts for certain school districts relating to open enrollment and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 3103.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to supplemental aid and modified supplemental amounts for certain school districts relating to open enrollment and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 3103.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Education. S.J. 621. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 349. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 345. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3103 (Related) 2022-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2348.