IA SF233 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 525. S.J. 504.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to criminal law including the disclosure of a defendant's privileged records, no-contact orders, commencement limitations for certain sexual offenses, sexually predatory offenses, victim rights, discovery, postconviction relief actions, criminal appeals, and pretrial bond amounts for certain felonies.(See SF 525.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to criminal law including the disclosure of a defendant's privileged records, no-contact orders, commencement limitations for certain sexual offenses, sexually predatory offenses, victim rights, discovery, postconviction relief actions, criminal appeals, and pretrial bond amounts for certain felonies.(See SF 525.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-06SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 525. S.J. 504.
2023-02-23SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2023 1:00PM Room 217 Conference Room.
2023-02-09SenateSubcommittee: Dawson, De Witt, and Weiner. S.J. 307.
2023-02-08SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 293.

Same As/Similar To

SF525 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 635.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback