IA SF2324 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Sent to Governor. S.J. 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Sent to Governor. S.J. 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to state departments and agencies from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund, the state bond repayment fund, the technology reinvestment fund, and the prison bonding fund, providing for related matters, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3188.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to state departments and agencies from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund, the state bond repayment fund, the technology reinvestment fund, and the prison bonding fund, providing for related matters, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3188.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - Passed House (Y: 62 N: 30 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - Passed House (Y: 62 N: 30 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | House | Sent to Governor. S.J. 0. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 0. |
2016-04-27 | House | Message from House. S.J. 798. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Immediate message. H.J. 769. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Passed House, ayes 85, nays 13. H.J. 766. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted. H.J. 765. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee report filed. H.J. 765. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Message from Senate. H.J. 764. |
2016-04-27 | House | Immediate message. S.J. 798. |
2016-04-27 | House | Passed Senate, ayes 27, nays 22. S.J. 796. |
2016-04-27 | House | Conference committee report adopted. S.J. 795. |
2016-04-27 | House | Conference committee report filed. S.J. 795. |
2016-04-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 755. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 785. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate conference committee appointed, McCoy, Anderson, Bowman, Chapman, and Petersen. S.J. 785. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 785. |
2016-04-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 750. |
2016-04-25 | House | Explanations of votes. H.J. 751. |
2016-04-25 | House | House conference committee appointed Huseman, Vander Linden, Holt, Cohoon, and Lykam. H.J. 748. |
2016-04-25 | House | House insisted. H.J. 748. |
2016-04-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 747. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 781. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Senate refused to concur with S-5174. S.J. 781. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5174. S.J. 779. |
2016-04-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 732. |
2016-04-25 | House | Passed House, ayes 62, nays 30. H.J. 731. |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment H-8280 filed, adopted. H.J. 731. |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment H-8279 filed, adopted. H.J. 731. |
2016-04-25 | House | Committee amendment H-8274 adopted. H.J. 731. |
2016-04-21 | House | Committee amendment H-8274 filed. H.J. 726. |
2016-04-21 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 724. |
2016-04-21 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2016-04-21 | House | Subcommittee, Huseman, Dunkel, and Worthan. H.J. 722. |
2016-04-20 | House | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 695. |
2016-04-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 691. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 747. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 27, nays 23. S.J. 747. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Amendment S-5149 filed, adopted. S.J. 747. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Amendment S-5147 filed, adopted. S.J. 747. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 737. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 736. |