IA SF2320 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Sent to Governor. S.J. 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Sent to Governor. S.J. 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to transportation and other infrastructure-related appropriations to the department of transportation, including allocation and use of moneys from the road use tax fund, the primary road fund, the state aviation fund, and the federal surface transportation block grant program.
Title
A bill for an act relating to transportation and other infrastructure-related appropriations to the department of transportation, including allocation and use of moneys from the road use tax fund, the primary road fund, the state aviation fund, and the federal surface transportation block grant program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-29 - House - Passed House (Y: 53 N: 36 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | House | Sent to Governor. S.J. 0. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 0. |
2016-04-29 | House | Message from House. S.J. 829. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Immediate message. H.J. 799. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Passed House, ayes 53, nays 36. H.J. 798. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted. H.J. 798. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee report filed. H.J. 797. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Message from Senate. H.J. 790. |
2016-04-29 | House | Immediate message. S.J. 822. |
2016-04-29 | House | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 19. S.J. 821. |
2016-04-29 | House | Conference committee report adopted. S.J. 821. |
2016-04-29 | House | Conference committee report filed. S.J. 820. |
2016-04-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 755. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 785. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate conference committee appointed, McCoy, Bowman, Petersen, Kapucian, and Schneider. S.J. 785. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 784. |
2016-04-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 750. |
2016-04-25 | House | House conference committee appointed Huseman, Vander Linden, Holt, Cohoon, and Lykam. H.J. 748. |
2016-04-25 | House | House insisted. H.J. 747. |
2016-04-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 747. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 781. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Senate refused to concur with S-5162. S.J. 780. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5162. S.J. 764. |
2016-04-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 721. |
2016-04-21 | House | Passed House, ayes 54, nays 41. H.J. 711. |
2016-04-21 | House | Amendment H-8268 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 710. |
2016-04-21 | House | Committee amendment H-8265 adopted. H.J. 710. |
2016-04-21 | House | Asked and received unanimous consent for the immediate consideration. H.J. 709. |
2016-04-20 | House | Committee amendment H-8265 filed. H.J. 702. |
2016-04-20 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 701. |
2016-04-20 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2016-04-20 | House | Subcommittee, Huseman, Dunkel, and Mommsen. H.J. 701. |
2016-04-19 | House | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 674. |
2016-04-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 669. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 729. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 27, nays 23. S.J. 728. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5143 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 728. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 721. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 720. |