IA SF2318 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 959.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 959.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the issuance of high school credit for satisfactory completion of high school-level units of instruction. (Formerly SF 2085.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the issuance of high school credit for satisfactory completion of high school-level units of instruction. (Formerly SF 2085.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 959. |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 945. |
2018-04-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 715. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 835. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays 0. S.J. 835. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5199. S.J. 835. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5199. S.J. 799. |
2018-03-27 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 689. |
2018-03-27 | House | Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 688. |
2018-03-27 | House | Amendment H-8311 adopted, as amended. H.J. 687. |
2018-03-27 | House | Amendment H-8322, to H-8311 filed, adopted. H.J. 687. |
2018-03-22 | House | Amendment H-8311 filed. H.J. 672. |
2018-03-22 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 671. |
2018-03-15 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 596. |
2018-03-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-03-08 | House | Subcommittee: Gassman, Bossman and Nielsen. H.J. 549. |
2018-03-08 | House | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 520. |
2018-03-07 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 495. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 579. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays 2. S.J. 576. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 351. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 342. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2085 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.