IA SF2318 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1073.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1073.
Summary
A bill for an act concerning and affecting veterans and military members, related to employment benefits, professional licensing, and interest rate limit enforcement, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 2213.) Effective 7-1-10.
Title
A bill for an act concerning and affecting veterans and military members, related to employment benefits, professional licensing, and interest rate limit enforcement, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 2213.) Effective 7-1-10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1073. | |
2010-03-30 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1070. | |
2010-03-30 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1070. | |
2010-03-16 | Message from Senate. H.J. 966. | |
2010-03-16 | Immediate message. S.J. 847. | |
2010-03-16 | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 844. | |
2010-03-16 | Senate concurred with S-5224. S.J. 844. | |
2010-03-10 | Message from House, with amendment S-5224. S.J. 756. | |
2010-03-09 | Immediate message. H.J. 887. | |
2010-03-09 | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 885. | |
2010-03-09 | Amendment H-8340 adopted. H.J. 885. | |
2010-03-04 | Amendment H-8340 filed. H.J. 823. | |
2010-03-03 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 817. | |
2010-02-24 | Subcommittee, Zirkelbach, Bukta, and Watts. H.J. 714. | |
2010-02-24 | Read first time, referred to Veterans Affairs. H.J. 693. | |
2010-02-23 | Message from Senate. H.J. 687. | |
2010-02-23 | Immediate message. S.J. 542. | |
2010-02-23 | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 537. | |
2010-02-15 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 385. | |
2010-02-15 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 365. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0881B&ga=83 |