IA SF2315 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the midwest interstate passenger rail compact, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3091.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the midwest interstate passenger rail compact, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3091.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-14SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537.
2024-02-20SenateAttached to HF 591. S.J. 340.
2024-02-13SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 280.
2024-02-13SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 276.

Same As/Similar To

SSB3091 (Related) 2024-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2315.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback