IA SF2314 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act increasing the amount of cash reserves mental health and disability services regions may have before affecting quarterly payment amounts and incentive fund eligibility.(Formerly SSB 3116.)
Title
A bill for an act increasing the amount of cash reserves mental health and disability services regions may have before affecting quarterly payment amounts and incentive fund eligibility.(Formerly SSB 3116.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/10/2022 8:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Goodwin, Dawson, and Jochum. S.J. 383. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 375. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 325. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 315. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3116 (Related) 2022-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2314.