IA SF2314 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Sent to Governor. S.J. 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Sent to Governor. S.J. 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to certain state departments, agencies, funds, and certain other entities, providing for regulatory authority and other properly related matters, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to certain state departments, agencies, funds, and certain other entities, providing for regulatory authority and other properly related matters, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 0. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 0. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Secretary's report on correction in engrossment. S.J. 760. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 754. |
2016-04-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 699. |
2016-04-20 | House | Passed House, ayes 56, nays 42. H.J. 698. |
2016-04-20 | House | Amendments H-8254 and H-8255 filed, lost. H.J. 698. |
2016-04-20 | House | Amendment H-8253 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 698. |
2016-04-20 | House | Amendment H-8252 filed, lost. H.J. 697. |
2016-04-19 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 686. |
2016-04-19 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2016-04-19 | House | Subcommittee, Landon, Forbes, and Worthan. H.J. 685. |
2016-04-19 | House | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 668. |
2016-04-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 663. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 715. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 24. S.J. 714. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Amendment S-5131 filed, adopted. S.J. 713. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 706. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 704. |