IA SF2311 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 754.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 754.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the definition of young adult for purposes of participation in the preparation for adult living program. (Formerly SSB 3058.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the definition of young adult for purposes of participation in the preparation for adult living program. (Formerly SSB 3058.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 754. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | HF 2220 substituted. S.J. 753. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5099 adopted. S.J. 753. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5099 filed. S.J. 686. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 2220. S.J. 429. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 340. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 336. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB534 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. H.J. 167.
SSB3058 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2311.
HF2220 (Similar To) 2020-06-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 789.
SSB3058 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2311.
HF2220 (Similar To) 2020-06-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 789.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2311 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2311.html |