IA SF231 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 457. S.J. 443.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to disciplinary action under city civil service.(See SF 457, SF 2325.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to disciplinary action under city civil service.(See SF 457, SF 2325.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-28SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 457. S.J. 443.
2023-02-15SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
2023-02-13SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2023 8:30AM Room 315.
2023-02-13SenateSubcommittee: Webster, Klimesh, and Weiner. S.J. 315.
2023-02-08SenateIntroduced, referred to Local Government. S.J. 293.

Same As/Similar To

HSB197 (Related) 2023-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
SF457 (Similar To) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2325. S.J. 294.
SF2325 (Similar To) 2024-03-19 - Amendment H-8221 filed. H.J. 626.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback