IA SF2297 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 554.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 554.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the investment of funds by life insurance companies and associations.(Formerly SSB 3108.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the investment of funds by life insurance companies and associations.(Formerly SSB 3108.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 554. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | HF 2405 substituted. S.J. 553. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Attached to HF 2405. S.J. 350. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 271. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 265. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB606 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2405.
SSB3108 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2297.
HF2405 (Similar To) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
SSB3108 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2297.
HF2405 (Similar To) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.