IA SF2288 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-02 - Withdrawn. S.J. 838.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-02 - Withdrawn. S.J. 838.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to municipal utility retirement systems. (Formerly SSB 3140.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to municipal utility retirement systems. (Formerly SSB 3140.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 838. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | HF 2379 substituted. S.J. 837. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 692. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 2379. S.J. 431. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 321. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 317. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3140 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB624 (Related) 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2379 (Similar To) 2018-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 768.
HSB624 (Related) 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2379 (Similar To) 2018-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 768.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF2288 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF2288.html |