IA SF2283 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-05 - Amendment S-5047 filed. S.J. 454.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-05 - Amendment S-5047 filed. S.J. 454.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to county supervisors, concerning county supervisor representation plans and county supervisor vacancies, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to county supervisors, concerning county supervisor representation plans and county supervisor vacancies, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government Report (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Amendment S-5047 filed. S.J. 454. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Amendment S-5030 filed. S.J. 419. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 278. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2024 5:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee: Driscoll, Klimesh, and Winckler. S.J. 253. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Local Government. S.J. 250. |