IA SF228 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Subcommittee, Bacon, Forbes, and R. Taylor. H.J. 733.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Subcommittee, Bacon, Forbes, and R. Taylor. H.J. 733.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the use of moneys in the anatomical gift public awareness and transplantation fund. (Formerly SSB 1118.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the use of moneys in the anatomical gift public awareness and transplantation fund. (Formerly SSB 1118.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Subcommittee, Bacon, Forbes, and R. Taylor. H.J. 733. |
2015-03-27 | House | Pursuant to Rule 31.7, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 723. |
2015-03-27 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 723. |
2015-03-26 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2015-03-17 | House | Subcommittee, L. Miller, Gaines, and Wills. H.J. 634. |
2015-03-12 | House | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 576. |
2015-03-12 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 574. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 579. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 577. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 295. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 292. |