IA SF2275 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 552.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 552.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the state, including unemployment benefits and civil torts.(Formerly SSB 3093.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the state, including unemployment benefits and civil torts.(Formerly SSB 3093.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 552. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 294. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 291. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB631 (Related) 2022-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2279.
SSB3093 (Related) 2022-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2275.
HF2279 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Amendments H-8135, H-8136 and H-8137 filed. H.J. 505.
SSB3093 (Related) 2022-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2275.
HF2279 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Amendments H-8135, H-8136 and H-8137 filed. H.J. 505.