IA SF2268 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 323.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 323.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to child care center staff ratios, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3065.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to child care center staff ratios, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3065.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5012 be adopted? (Y: 19 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5012 be adopted? (Y: 19 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 323. |
2022-02-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 320. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 343. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 18. S.J. 343. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Amendment S-5012 filed, lost. S.J. 342. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 340. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 279. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 275. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB511 (Related) 2022-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2131.
SSB3065 (Related) 2022-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2268.
HF2131 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Amendments H-8106, H-8107 and H-8108 filed. H.J. 441.
SSB3065 (Related) 2022-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2268.
HF2131 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Amendments H-8106, H-8107 and H-8108 filed. H.J. 441.