IA SF2260 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the school tuition organization tax credit available against the individual and corporate income tax and including retroactive applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the school tuition organization tax credit available against the individual and corporate income tax and including retroactive applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2020 12:00PM RM 315. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Dawson, and Wahls. S.J. 337. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 303. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2260 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2260.html |