IA SF2256 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 859.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to campaign finance, including electronic filing requirements for statements and reports filed with the ethics and campaign disclosure board and disclosure requirements for contributions made to candidates or committees. (Formerly SSB 3111.) Effective 7-1-18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to campaign finance, including electronic filing requirements for statements and reports filed with the ethics and campaign disclosure board and disclosure requirements for contributions made to candidates or committees. (Formerly SSB 3111.) Effective 7-1-18.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02SenateSigned by Governor. S.J. 859.
2018-04-02SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 844.
2018-03-21SenateMessage from House. S.J. 741.
2018-03-21HouseImmediate message. H.J. 649.
2018-03-21HousePassed House, ayes 100, nays none. H.J. 637.
2018-03-21HousePoint of order raised, Speaker ruled point well taken H.J. 637.
2018-03-07HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 516.
2018-02-28HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2018-02-27HouseSubcommittee reassigned: Kaufmann, Cownie and Winckler. H.J. 427.
2018-02-26HouseSubcommittee: Cownie, Kaufmann and Winckler. H.J. 394.
2018-02-23HouseRead first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 375.
2018-02-22HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 355.
2018-02-21SenateImmediate message. S.J. 417.
2018-02-21SenatePassed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 415.
2018-02-12SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 296.
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 288.

Same As/Similar To

SSB3111 (Related) 2018-01-31 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2018 1:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback