IA SF225 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the acquisition of title of abandoned property in the unincorporated area of a county.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the acquisition of title of abandoned property in the unincorporated area of a county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2021 10:00AM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Subcommittee: Klimesh, Guth, and J. Smith. S.J. 252. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Local Government. S.J. 217. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF225 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF225.html |