IA SF2245 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the possession and storage of firearms by a tenant of a dwelling unit or mobile home space and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the possession and storage of firearms by a tenant of a dwelling unit or mobile home space and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2020 8:30AM RM G17. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Kinney, and Shipley. S.J. 307. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 285. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2245 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2245.html |