IA SF2243 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2018 3:00PM House Lounge.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2018 3:00PM House Lounge.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting the use of false or misleading caller identification information to certain persons, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 2126.)
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting the use of false or misleading caller identification information to certain persons, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 2126.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2018 3:00PM House Lounge. |
2018-03-13 | House | Subcommittee: Holz, Fisher and McConkey. H.J. 577. |
2018-03-07 | House | Read first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 492. |
2018-03-06 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 474. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 543. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays 0. S.J. 542. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Amendment S-5099 filed, adopted. S.J. 542. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 291. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 286. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2126 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.