IA SF2235 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2356. S.J. 373.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the education of students with characteristics of dyslexia and to the preparation and licensure of practitioners who provide such instruction, and establishing an Iowa dyslexia board. (See SF 2356.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the education of students with characteristics of dyslexia and to the preparation and licensure of practitioners who provide such instruction, and establishing an Iowa dyslexia board. (See SF 2356.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2356. S.J. 373.
2020-02-18SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2020-02-17SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/18/2020 10:30AM RM 217.
2020-02-12SenateSubcommittee: Behn, Giddens, and Lofgren. S.J. 291.
2020-02-11SenateIntroduced, referred to Education. S.J. 273.

Same As/Similar To

SF2356 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Message from Senate. H.J. 397.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback