IA SF2232 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 814.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 814.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the sale, lease, or rental of water treatment systems and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3056.) Effective date: 01/01/2023. Applicability date: 01/01/2023.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the sale, lease, or rental of water treatment systems and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3056.) Effective date: 01/01/2023. Applicability date: 01/01/2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 814. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 803. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 594. |
2022-03-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 624. |
2022-03-22 | House | Passed House, yeas 94, nays 0. H.J. 608. |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on calendar. H.J. 440. |
2022-03-01 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 440. |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-02-24 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2022 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2022-02-22 | House | Subcommittee: Lundgren, McConkey and Nordman. H.J. 395. |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 322. |
2022-02-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 305. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 338. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 336. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 254. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 245. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3056 (Related) 2022-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2232.