IA SF2229 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting political subdivisions from purchasing or acquiring certain fire fighting or fire-suppressing foam containing perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances.
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting political subdivisions from purchasing or acquiring certain fire fighting or fire-suppressing foam containing perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2024 10:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Westrich, Giddens, and Webster. S.J. 269. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 224. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF2229 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF2229.html |