IA SF2222 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the juvenile detention home fund.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the juvenile detention home fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Edler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2022 11:00AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Costello, and Ragan. S.J. 278. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 219. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF2222 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF2222.html |