IA SF2219 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Behn, and Quirmbach. S.J. 290.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Behn, and Quirmbach. S.J. 290.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the authority of the college student aid commission to organize a nonprofit corporation.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the authority of the college student aid commission to organize a nonprofit corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Behn, and Quirmbach. S.J. 290. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 259. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2126 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 393.
HF2291 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Behn, and Quirmbach. S.J. 469.
HF2291 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Behn, and Quirmbach. S.J. 469.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2219 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2219.html |