IA SF2214 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 764.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 764.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to horse racing regulated by the racing and gaming commission. (Formerly SSB 3118.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to horse racing regulated by the racing and gaming commission. (Formerly SSB 3118.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 764. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | HF 2439 substituted. S.J. 763. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Amendment S-5144 adopted. S.J. 763. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 692. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Amendment S-5144 filed. S.J. 672. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 2439. S.J. 649. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 281. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 272. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3118 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF2214 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF2214.html |