IA SF2208 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Subcommittee: Nunn, Mathis, and Williams. S.J. 250.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Subcommittee: Nunn, Mathis, and Williams. S.J. 250.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to consumer data protection, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to consumer data protection, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Zach Nunn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee: Nunn, Mathis, and Williams. S.J. 250. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. S.J. 217. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB674 (Related) 2022-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2506.
HF2506 (Similar To) 2022-03-15 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Boulton, and Zaun. S.J. 513.
HF2506 (Similar To) 2022-03-15 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Boulton, and Zaun. S.J. 513.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF2208 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF2208.html |