IA SF2205 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 809.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 809.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to requirements for the hiring of civil service positions. (Formerly SF 454, SF 266.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to requirements for the hiring of civil service positions. (Formerly SF 454, SF 266.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Local Government Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Local Government Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 809. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 808. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 637. |
2024-03-26 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 680. |
2024-03-27 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 690. |
2024-03-26 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 673. |
2024-03-21 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 635. |
2024-03-18 | House | Placed on calendar. H.J. 607. |
2024-03-12 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 607. |
2024-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-02-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2024 12:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2024-02-22 | House | Subcommittee: Dunwell, Abdul-Samad and Henderson. H.J. 382. |
2024-02-21 | House | Read first time, referred to Local Government. H.J. 341. |
2024-02-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 321. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 349. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 346. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Amendment S-5013 out of order. S.J. 346. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Amendment S-5017 filed, adopted. S.J. 346. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5013 filed. S.J. 339. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 204. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 197. |
Same As/Similar To
SF266 (Similar To) 2023-02-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 454. S.J. 442.
SF454 (Similar To) 2024-02-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2205. S.J. 204.
SF454 (Similar To) 2024-02-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2205. S.J. 204.