IA SF2200 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 946.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 946.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act regulating veterans’ benefit services and related events, by requiring certain disclosures and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3067.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act regulating veterans’ benefit services and related events, by requiring certain disclosures and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3067.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 946. |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 945. |
2018-04-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 714. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 835. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays 0. S.J. 834. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5166. S.J. 833. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5166. S.J. 715. |
2018-03-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 615. |
2018-03-20 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 631. |
2018-03-19 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 602. |
2018-03-19 | House | Amendment H-8215 adopted. H.J. 602. |
2018-03-19 | House | Substituted for HF 2368. H.J. 601. |
2018-03-15 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 592. |
2018-03-07 | House | Amendment H-8215 filed. H.J. 517. |
2018-02-21 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 334. |
2018-02-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 328. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 388. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 0. S.J. 387. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 257. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 253. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3067 (Related) 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB580 (Related) 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2368 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 615.
HSB580 (Related) 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2368 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 615.