IA SF2199 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Attached to companion HF 2373. S.J. 500.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Attached to companion HF 2373. S.J. 500.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the qualifications necessary for an applicant for licensure as a professional engineer. (Formerly SSB 3049.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the qualifications necessary for an applicant for licensure as a professional engineer. (Formerly SSB 3049.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 2373. S.J. 500. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 262. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 255. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3049 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2199.
HSB546 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 254.
HF2373 (Similar To) 2020-03-03 - Read first time, attached to companion SF 2199. S.J. 500.
HSB546 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 254.
HF2373 (Similar To) 2020-03-03 - Read first time, attached to companion SF 2199. S.J. 500.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2199 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2199.html |