IA SF2191 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 768.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 768.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to authorized uses of interest earned on funds in the flood recovery fund and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3007.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to authorized uses of interest earned on funds in the flood recovery fund and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3007.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 768. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | HF 2515 substituted. S.J. 767. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 2515. S.J. 674. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 553. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 208. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 201. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3007 (Related) 2022-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2191.
HSB572 (Related) 2022-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2138.
HF2138 (Similar To) 2022-03-30 - Withdrawn. H.J. 750.
HF2515 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 869.
HSB572 (Related) 2022-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2138.
HF2138 (Similar To) 2022-03-30 - Withdrawn. H.J. 750.
HF2515 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 869.