IA SF218 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-10 - Subcommittee: Kinney, Dawson, and Zaun. S.J. 83.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-10 - Subcommittee: Kinney, Dawson, and Zaun. S.J. 83.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to carrying weapons on school grounds by a certified peace officer or a reserve peace officer. (Formerly SF 87.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to carrying weapons on school grounds by a certified peace officer or a reserve peace officer. (Formerly SF 87.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | Senate | Subcommittee: Kinney, Dawson, and Zaun. S.J. 83. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 245. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 245. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 241. |
Same As/Similar To
SF87 (Similar To) 2017-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF218 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF218.html |