IA SF2177 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 902.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 902.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to consumer protection modifying provisions applicable to consumer security freezes and personal information security breach protection, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2054.) Various effective dates; see section 10 of bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to consumer protection modifying provisions applicable to consumer security freezes and personal information security breach protection, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2054.) Various effective dates; see section 10 of bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 902. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 901. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 809. |
2018-03-28 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 699. |
2018-03-28 | House | Passed House, ayes 100, nays none. H.J. 696. |
2018-03-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8297. H.J. 695. |
2018-03-20 | House | Senate amendment H-8297 filed. H.J. 632. |
2018-03-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 624. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 720. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 717. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5083, as amended. S.J. 716. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Amendment S-5153 out of order. S.J. 716. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Amendment S-5159 adopted. S.J. 716. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Amendment S-5159 to House amendment S-5083 filed. S.J. 689. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Amendment S-5153 to House amendment S-5083 filed. S.J. 673. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5083. S.J. 502. |
2018-03-01 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 441. |
2018-03-05 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 460. |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed House, ayes 96 nays none. H.J. 439. |
2018-03-01 | House | Amendment H-8150 adopted. H.J. 439. |
2018-03-01 | House | Substituted for HF 2423. H.J. 438. |
2018-02-28 | House | Amendment H-8150 filed. H.J. 431. |
2018-02-21 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 334. |
2018-02-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 328. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 388. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 0. S.J. 386. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 241. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 236. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2054 (Similar To) 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.