IA SF2166 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 704.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to redemption by certain persons of parcels sold at tax sale. (Formerly SSB 3012.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to redemption by certain persons of parcels sold at tax sale. (Formerly SSB 3012.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19SenateWithdrawn. S.J. 704.
2018-03-19SenateHF 2318 substituted. S.J. 703.
2018-03-15SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 692.
2018-03-14SenateDeferred. S.J. 683.
2018-03-08SenateAttached to companion HF 2318. S.J. 597.
2018-02-05SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 229.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 225.

Same As/Similar To

SSB3012 (Related) 2018-01-29 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB605 (Related) 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2318 (Similar To) 2018-03-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 700.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback