IA SF2164 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Signed by governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to public school funding by modifying provisions relating to the regular program state cost per pupil and to appropriations to the transportation equity fund and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2143, SSB 3097.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to public school funding by modifying provisions relating to the regular program state cost per pupil and to appropriations to the transportation equity fund and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2143, SSB 3097.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25SenateSigned by governor
2020-02-24SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 406.
2020-02-13SenateNOBA: Final
2020-02-12SenateMessage from House. S.J. 279.
2020-02-11HouseImmediate message. H.J. 247.
2020-02-11HousePassed House, yeas 98, nays 1. H.J. 240.
2020-02-11HouseAmendment H-8013 withdrawn. H.J. 240.
2020-02-11HouseSubstituted for HF 2245. H.J. 239.
2020-02-10HouseNOBA: Senate Floor
2020-02-10HouseAmendment H-8013 filed. H.J. 236.
2020-02-10HouseIntroduced, passed on file. H.J. 229.
2020-02-10HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 228.
2020-02-10SenateImmediate message. S.J. 250.
2020-02-10SenatePassed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 247.
2020-02-06SenateNOBA: Senate Full Approps
2020-02-05SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 219.
2020-02-05SenateIntroduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 213.

Same As/Similar To

SSB3097 (Related) 2020-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2143.
SF2143 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2164. S.J. 219.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback