IA SF2150 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Subcommittee: R. Smith, Giddens, and Johnson. S.J. 274.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Subcommittee: R. Smith, Giddens, and Johnson. S.J. 274.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to requirements for licensees under the purview of the dental board relating to orthodontia services.
Title
A bill for an act relating to requirements for licensees under the purview of the dental board relating to orthodontia services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: R. Smith, Giddens, and Johnson. S.J. 274. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 204. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2157 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 565.
HF2437 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Subcommittee: Johnson, Celsi, and Whiting. S.J. 680.
HF2437 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Subcommittee: Johnson, Celsi, and Whiting. S.J. 680.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2150 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2150.html |